U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-40368
  • Case Name: Jessica Rae Kaiser
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
  • March 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Post-petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Post-petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
September, 2020
  • September 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.