U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-40371
  • Case Name: Lawrence Mercier Schwab, II and Eraina Lee Schwab
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Post-petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.