U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-10154
  • Case Name: Oscar Eugene Carr and Beatrice Evon Carr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Payment of Chapter 7 Reopening Fee]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
August, 2021
  • August 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property From Debtor]
  • April 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (text order)]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement re: Death/Incompetency of Debtor]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (Text Order)]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (fee required)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.