U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-10071
  • Case Name: Dennis Lloyd Schnaser
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
January, 2021
  • January 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.