U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-40378
  • Case Name: John Steven Ivarsen and Shannon Marie Ivarsen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (text entry only)]
  • December 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Filing Proof of Claim]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (without notice)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • August 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice (Nonstandard)]
September, 2021
  • September 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (without notice)]
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (without notice)]
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amend Order (no notice required)]
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - hrng held (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
  • February 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Amendment]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (Text Order)]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry)]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry)]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice (Nonstandard) (deactivated)]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.