U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-40381
  • Case Name: Rhonda Kay Koepp
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Closing Case]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement re: Death/Incompetency of Debtor]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.