U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-10075
  • Case Name: Scott Steven Syverson and Sheila Dawn Syverson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - hrng held (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • October 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • August 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (text entry only)]
  • August 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order (no notice required)]
June, 2022
  • June 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
  • June 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
March, 2022
  • March 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (text order)]
  • March 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
November, 2021
  • November 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - hrng held (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
  • February 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • January 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry)]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry)]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • October 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.