open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:20-cr-40106-1
    Party Name:USA v. Walth
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69711
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =