open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:20-30020
    Party Name:Larae Alane Schoenfelder and Paul Ervin Schoenfelder
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?55033
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =