U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 06, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 04, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 17, 2021: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 17, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 06, 2020: [Text Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2020: [Request]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.