U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-10085
  • Case Name: Teiara Jean Holmstrom
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
September, 2021
  • September 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of TFR (used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (without notice)]
June, 2021
  • June 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Support Document]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (Text Order)]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • February 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Payment of Installment Fee - Chapter 7]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • January 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Payment of Installment Fee - Chapter 7]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Payment of Installment Fee - Chapter 7]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appointment Rejection]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Rejection]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.