U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30021
  • Case Name: Cody Wayne Cruse
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.