U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-40428
  • Case Name: Dennis Raymond Haarsma
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Case Reassigned]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Ch 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution F-non-consensual plan consummated, fees awarded]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Compensation]
  • December 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Notice of Substantial Consummation]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Compensation]
  • November 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Compensation]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Status Report]
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Compensation]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Compensation]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Post Confirmation Order]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Post Confirmation Order]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Confirming Plan]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Compensation]
  • October 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Employment of Professional (text order)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Employment of Professional]
August, 2021
  • August 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Summary]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Joinder]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Reschedule Hearing (text order)]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Sample Ballot Form]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Modified Plan]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • May 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Stipulation]
  • May 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Response]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Compensation]
  • March 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Employment of Professional (text order)]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Joinder]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Employment of Professional]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Compensation]
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Sample Ballot Form]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Late Notice]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Plan]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Pre-Status Conference Report]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Statement of Conclusion]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Nonstandard Order]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Kapusta, Thomas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.