U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave Heart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Request]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.