U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-10045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soft
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2022: [Consent]
  • September 26, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Consent]
  • March 28, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2022: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • February 23, 2022: [Request]
  • February 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.