U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-50001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holy Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 09, 2024: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 09, 2024: [Request re Evidence]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2024: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 07, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Bail Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.