U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andrade
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 08, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • May 06, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 05, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 02, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2024: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.