U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30054-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Stahlhoefer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 21, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • April 07, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 10, 2025: [Consent]
January, 2025
  • January 25, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Notice of Filing Error]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.