U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-40100-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Knight et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 02, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • April 01, 2025: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 31, 2025: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 31, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 27, 2025: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • March 27, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 27, 2025: [Jury Question]
  • March 27, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 27, 2025: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Verdict]
  • March 27, 2025: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 26, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 25, 2025: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Jury List]
  • March 24, 2025: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 24, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 21, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 20, 2025: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 20, 2025: [Consent]
  • March 20, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2025: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 14, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 11, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.