U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40180
  • Case Name: Lucas Anthony Fisher and Kara Regina Fisher
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (text order)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Correspondence (public entry)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (text order)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Correspondence (public entry)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.