U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-04103
  • Case Name: Counts v. Wasko et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter Received]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Motion Response]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 30, 2025: [Response]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Leave to]
  • October 09, 2024: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 07, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.