U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dominquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 06, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.