U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Declaration of Publication]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Expert Witness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.