U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-40022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Franzky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 01, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Brief]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Subpoena(s)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.