U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barse et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • May 07, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 07, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 07, 2025: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Verdict]
  • May 07, 2025: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Jury Question]
  • May 07, 2025: [Jury Question]
  • May 07, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 06, 2025: [Jury List]
  • May 06, 2025: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • May 06, 2025: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 02, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Witness List]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • April 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 25, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.