U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40039-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Trimble et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sealed Continuance Motion under 18:3161 (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 07, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 22, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Request re Evidence]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Hearing]
  • January 03, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 10, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2024: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 09, 2024: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 09, 2024: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 09, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.