U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-40033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Debevec
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
  • May 01, 2025: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • May 01, 2025: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 01, 2025: [Transcript - Public]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 28, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 25, 2025: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 08, 2025: [Response]
  • January 06, 2025: [Supplement]
  • January 04, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [In Limine]
  • December 30, 2024: [Response]
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.