U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nigro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.