U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-50075
  • Case Name: Thomas John Neiffer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (text order)]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.