U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-30017
  • Case Name: Lorie Ann Thomas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (text order)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 13, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Counseling]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.