U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bald Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Leave to]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 11, 2024: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.