U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-50065
  • Case Name: Joseph Randall Sorensen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Brief]
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
December, 2024
  • December 14, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2024
  • October 18, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Claim]
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.