U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40339
  • Case Name: Brian Lynn Dalen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Plan]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
November, 2024
  • November 14, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.