U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 08, 2025: [Forfeiture]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 22, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 08, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.