U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40124-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Schneiderman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 28, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2025: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
November, 2024
  • November 25, 2024: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.