U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garrett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 08, 2025: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss Indictment/Information/Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 06, 2025: [Reply]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Received]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 06, 2024: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.