U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30037-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Millard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 08, 2025: [Competency/Psychiatric Evaluation and/or Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent]
  • April 17, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Consent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.