U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40045
  • Case Name: Christopher James Miles and Darci Lynn Miles
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Correspondence (public entry)]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.