U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-05070
  • Case Name: Retsel Corporation et al v. NDN Collective et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Motion Response]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Request for Issuance of Summons(es)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.