U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2025: [Consent]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Furlough]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2025: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.