U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zapata
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 06, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.