U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Crow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Consent to Forfeiture]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.