U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40015
  • Case Name: Gilbert Lee Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
January, 2025
  • January 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.