U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40016
  • Case Name: Daniel Lee Welynn and Lauren Elizabeth Moller-Welynn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Turnover of Property From Debtor]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Notice of Amendment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Objection]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Hearing Minutes (new)]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meadors, Robert [Receipt of Filing Fee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.