U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Battese
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 02, 2025: [Consent]
  • May 02, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 25, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.