U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-40026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santos-Mejia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 14, 2025: [Combined Plea and Sentencing Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Transcript OR Ex Parte Transcript]
  • March 05, 2025: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.