U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-30086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Eagle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2025: [Consent]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 19, 2025: [Consent]
  • March 19, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2025: [Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.