U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40178
  • Case Name: Kirstin Marie Wolf
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • March 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.