U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mousseau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 15, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2025: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.