U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-40128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wako
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 02, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • April 30, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • April 29, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Continuance Motion under 18:3161 (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sealed Continuance Motion under 18:3161 (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 28, 2025: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • March 26, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • March 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.